TN HB2794 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medical assistance pursuant to the Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medical assistance pursuant to the Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2707 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee