TN HB2915 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Failed in Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Coronavirus Public Protection Act of 2020," which authorizes the governor to enter into immediate negotiations with the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services and the office of the president of the United States, and seek all necessary waivers, to provide primary care to all uninsured citizens of this state relative to the prevention and treatment of coronavirus. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Coronavirus Public Protection Act of 2020," which authorizes the governor to enter into immediate negotiations with the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services and the office of the president of the United States, and seek all necessary waivers, to provide primary care to all uninsured citizens of this state relative to the prevention and treatment of coronavirus. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseFailed in Delayed Bill Committee
2020-05-29HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020
2020-03-05HouseRef. to Delayed Bills Comm.
2020-03-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback