TN HJR0051 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Failed in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Failed in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports establishment of a Full Employment National Trust Fund.
Title
Supports establishment of a Full Employment National Trust Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Failed in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |