TN HJR0127 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges state to increase awareness of sexual abuse and the substance abuse and crime that result from sexual abuse.
Title
Urges state to increase awareness of sexual abuse and the substance abuse and crime that result from sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |