TN HJR0140 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urges state and federal courts to refrain from giving judicial deference to state agencies in their interpretation of statutes and administrative rules.
Title
Urges state and federal courts to refrain from giving judicial deference to state agencies in their interpretation of statutes and administrative rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 78, Nays 8, PNV 2 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0332) |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0454) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |