TN HJR0143 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and emphasizes prohibition against monopolies in Tennessee.
Title
Recognizes and emphasizes prohibition against monopolies in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Intro., ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |