TN HJR0149 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Department of Education to address the negative impacts of recent legislation on local education agencies.
Title
Urges the Department of Education to address the negative impacts of recent legislation on local education agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |