TN HJR0150 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports ratification of the proposed Equal Rights Amendment to the United States Constitution; calls on the United States Congress to remove the deadline for ratifying the Equal Rights Amendment by the states.
Title
Supports ratification of the proposed Equal Rights Amendment to the United States Constitution; calls on the United States Congress to remove the deadline for ratifying the Equal Rights Amendment by the states.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |