TN HJR0397 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Secretary of State to include the Appalachian dialect in Section VI of the Tennessee Blue Book.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Secretary of State to include the Appalachian dialect in Section VI of the Tennessee Blue Book.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-24HouseAdopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-23HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019
2019-04-23HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/23/2019
2019-04-08HouseIntro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRef. to Delayed Bill Committee
2019-04-02HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback