TN HJR0613 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-26)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-26)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates House Seat 34 in the House Chamber of the State Capitol as the "Charles Sargent Memorial."
Title
Designates House Seat 34 in the House Chamber of the State Capitol as the "Charles Sargent Memorial."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-24 | House | R/S Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Filed for introduction |