TN HJR0789 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Stillbirth Awareness and Remembrance Day, October 12, 2020
Title
Stillbirth Awareness and Remembrance Day, October 12, 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-06 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/6/20 |
2020-02-05 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. on 2/5/20 |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/5/20 |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |