TN HJR0807 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges P.O.S.T. Commission to include P.O.S.T.-certified training on interacting with individuals with autism and autism spectrum disorder in its 2020 law enforcement course offerings.
Title
Urges P.O.S.T. Commission to include P.O.S.T.-certified training on interacting with individuals with autism and autism spectrum disorder in its 2020 law enforcement course offerings.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-16 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |