TN HJR0815 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Suggests that the second floor of the State Capitol be used as a space to recognize elected officials.
Title
Suggests that the second floor of the State Capitol be used as a space to recognize elected officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - HOUSE NAMING, DESIGNATING, & PRIVATE ACTS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to State (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to State Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-04-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/17/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee-- State |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |