TN HJR0818 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 67-21)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Harriet Tubman Day
Title
Harriet Tubman Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-06 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/20 |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |