TN HJR0825 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the department of education to allow school districts the freedom to select the Response to Instruction and Intervention (RTIĀ²) assessments they use.
Title
Urges the department of education to allow school districts the freedom to select the Response to Instruction and Intervention (RTIĀ²) assessments they use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |