TN HJR0827 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for H.R. 1954, the Cellphone Jamming Reform Act of 2019.
Title
Expresses support for H.R. 1954, the Cellphone Jamming Reform Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |