TN HJR0828 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the importance of the honeybee and pollinators to the agricultural industry of Tennessee.
Title
Recognizes the importance of the honeybee and pollinators to the agricultural industry of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Meeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/17/20 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |