TN HJR0933 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses intent of the General Assembly that Tennessee hold the first presidential primary state in the nation.
Title
Expresses intent of the General Assembly that Tennessee hold the first presidential primary state in the nation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bill Committee |
2020-05-29 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020 |
2020-02-24 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0933&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0933.pdf |