TN HJR1159 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the State of Tennessee for being the best fiscally managed state in the nation and urges Congress to deny bailouts for states that have not soundly managed their budgets.
Title
Recognizes the State of Tennessee for being the best fiscally managed state in the nation and urges Congress to deny bailouts for states that have not soundly managed their budgets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-06-12 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-06-01 | House | Filed for introduction |