TN HR0220 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expels David Byrd from his seat as a member of the House of Representatives of the One Hundred Eleventh General Assembly.
Title
Expels David Byrd from his seat as a member of the House of Representatives of the One Hundred Eleventh General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HR0220&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HR0220.pdf |