TN SB0003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Fair Maps Act," which establishes requirements for the process of redistricting congressional and general assembly districts. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 1, relative to redistricting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-11-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0971 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee