TN SB0023 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, vacates the offices of the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections if either election officer qualifies as a candidate for any public office. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 3, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, vacates the offices of the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections if either election officer qualifies as a candidate for any public office. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 3, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-01-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on Clerk''s Desk pending committe appointments.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0029 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback