TN SB0023 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 7, relative to evidence of identification for voting.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1283 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-02 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee