TN SB0024 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a presumption that a minor who is the victim of a sexual offense or engaged in prostitution held a reasonable belief that the use of force is immediately necessary to avoid imminent death or serious bodily injury. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, establishes a presumption that a minor who is the victim of a sexual offense or engaged in prostitution held a reasonable belief that the use of force is immediately necessary to avoid imminent death or serious bodily injury. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on Clerk''s Desk pending committe appointments. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0017 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee