TN SB0029 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends compensation for death of emergency responders to emergency medical technicians and paramedics; authorizes local governments to continue to provide health insurance to the surviving spouse and children of an emergency medical technician or paramedic killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
As enacted, extends compensation for death of emergency responders to emergency medical technicians and paramedics; authorizes local governments to continue to provide health insurance to the surviving spouse and children of an emergency medical technician or paramedic killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 776 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0384 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 776