TN SB0029 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 03/24/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 03/24/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits local governments dismissing, disciplining, fining, or penalizing a first responder employed by a local government, or denying employment to a person applying to be a first responder, based on where the first responder or applicant resides; exempts Hamilton County from prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8, Chapter 50; Title 8, Chapter 8; Title 38, Chapter 8; Title 68, Chapter 140 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8, Chapter 50; Title 8, Chapter 8; Title 38, Chapter 8; Title 68, Chapter 140 and Title 68, Chapter 102, relative to residency requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 5 BY CHISM PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Amend Amend# 2 by Gardenhire (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 5 BY CHISM PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Amend Amend# 2 by Gardenhire (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/24/2022 | |
2022-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 720 | |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75 Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Am. reconsidered, withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0510) |
2022-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2022-03-14 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 56, Nays 19, PNV 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0510) |
2022-02-24 | House | Failed to adopt Am. (Amendment 5 - HA0549), Ayes 20, Nays 63, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0539) |
2022-02-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0538) |
2022-02-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0537) |
2022-02-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0022) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0015) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/25/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0105 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 720