TN SB0033 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the Tennessee School for the Blind, the Tennessee School for the Deaf, the West Tennessee School for the Deaf, and the Alvin C. York Agricultural Institute from sharing the same president, director of schools, or officers at the same time. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits the Tennessee School for the Blind, the Tennessee School for the Deaf, the West Tennessee School for the Deaf, and the Alvin C. York Agricultural Institute from sharing the same president, director of schools, or officers at the same time. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0025 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 460

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback