TN SB0035 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class C felony offense of reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm into a parade, religious service, concert, athletic event, political event, educational event, or into any other group of 25 or more people who are lawfully assembled. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class C felony offense of reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm into a parade, religious service, concert, athletic event, political event, educational event, or into any other group of 25 or more people who are lawfully assembled. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0135 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020