TN SB0044 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, gives a person 65 years of age or older who applies for a photo identification license the option to receive a photo identification license that does not expire, instead of automatically receiving a photo identification license that does not expire. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, gives a person 65 years of age or older who applies for a photo identification license the option to receive a photo identification license that does not expire, instead of automatically receiving a photo identification license that does not expire. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 145 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 6, PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0169) |
2019-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0186) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0181 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 145