TN SB0050 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to create a three-year early learning pilot program, to begin in the 2019-2020 school year, to identify early learning programs that provide opportunities for quality early childhood education and improvement in student outcomes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to create a three-year early learning pilot program, to begin in the 2019-2020 school year, to identify early learning programs that provide opportunities for quality early childhood education and improvement in student outcomes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0060 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education