TN SB0057 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the requirement that, for purposes of eligibility for Tennessee HOPE scholarships as a dependent child of active military parent, the parent's home of record be Tennessee and the child must be eligible for in-state tuition at the time of enrollment. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-926.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the requirement that, for purposes of eligibility for Tennessee HOPE scholarships as a dependent child of active military parent, the parent's home of record be Tennessee and the child must be eligible for in-state tuition at the time of enrollment. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-926.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenateAction Def. in S. F,W&M to 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
2013-04-15SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-11SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
2013-04-10SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013
2013-04-10SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013
2013-04-09SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-09SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
2013-04-08SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
2013-03-13SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-07SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-14SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0427 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback