TN SB0057 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows students receiving the Tennessee HOPE scholarship to drop from full-time to part-time status once without medical or personal grounds and without loss of the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows students receiving the Tennessee HOPE scholarship to drop from full-time to part-time status once without medical or personal grounds and without loss of the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
2015-03-25SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
2015-03-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/25/2015
2015-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2015
2015-03-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/11/2015
2015-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
2015-02-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/4/2015
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Education Committee
2015-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-15SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0799 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Failed for lack of second in: Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback