TN SB0060 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on feminine hygiene products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on feminine hygiene products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means with negative recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0095 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee