TN SB0063 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands career and technical education programs to middle school grades; requires the board of career and technical education to plan facilities for comprehensive career and technical training for middle school students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, expands career and technical education programs to middle school grades; requires the board of career and technical education to plan facilities for comprehensive career and technical training for middle school students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 366 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2019-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0403) |
2019-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0379) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reset on next available calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0866 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 366