TN SB0106 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a county election commission to place absentee voting ballot boxes at locations within its jurisdiction other than at the commission's office. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to absentee voting ballot boxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1158 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.