TN SB0135 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires Shelby and Davidson counties to conduct nonpartisan elections for all state trial court judgeships, county judicial offices, and judicial clerk offices. - Amends TCA Section 2-13-203.
Title
As introduced, requires Shelby and Davidson counties to conduct nonpartisan elections for all state trial court judgeships, county judicial offices, and judicial clerk offices. - Amends TCA Section 2-13-203.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0098 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-28 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee