TN SB0162 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a pilot program for three years to provide child care payments to eligible relative caregivers; requires the department of children's services to publish an annual report containing certain data about the pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 71, relative to caregivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0466 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.