TN SB0165 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2018; schedules the Tennessee Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers Rule 0660-11-.05, relative to professional conduct, and filed in the office of secretary of state on December 12, 2018, to expire on May 21, 2019; specifies that, effective July 1, 2019, the department of revenue is no longer prohibited from collecting internet sales or use taxes pursuant to Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2). - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2018; schedules the Tennessee Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers Rule 0660-11-.05, relative to professional conduct, and filed in the office of secretary of state on December 12, 2018, to expire on May 21, 2019; specifies that, effective July 1, 2019, the department of revenue is no longer prohibited from collecting internet sales or use taxes pursuant to Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2). - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0667 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 429

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback