TN SB0170 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires LEAs and public charter schools to adopt a trauma-informed discipline policy; requires the department of education to develop guidance on trauma-informed discipline practices that LEAs must use to develop a trauma-informed discipline policy. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires LEAs and public charter schools to adopt a trauma-informed discipline policy; requires the department of education to develop guidance on trauma-informed discipline practices that LEAs must use to develop a trauma-informed discipline policy. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0405 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 421

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback