TN SB0173 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits a person from physically holding or supporting, with any part of the person's body, a wireless telecommunications device or stand-alone electronic device while operating a motor vehicle; imposes other similar restrictions on activities such as texting; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits a person from physically holding or supporting, with any part of the person's body, a wireless telecommunications device or stand-alone electronic device while operating a motor vehicle; imposes other similar restrictions on activities such as texting; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 412
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0164 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 412

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback