TN SB0174 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the administrator or executor of an estate to swear an oath that the representative is not disqualified from serving due to a sentence of imprisonment in a penitentiary. - Amends TCA Title 30 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, requires the administrator or executor of an estate to swear an oath that the representative is not disqualified from serving due to a sentence of imprisonment in a penitentiary. - Amends TCA Title 30 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 332 | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0190 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 332