TN SB0176 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 583
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 583
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Four Lake regional industrial developmental authority, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, extends the Four Lake regional industrial developmental authority, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 583 | |
2012-02-06 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/6/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/1/2012 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0629 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 583