TN SB0176 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to investigate certain actions of fraud, theft or misconduct in department programs. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapters 1, 3 and 5.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to investigate certain actions of fraud, theft or misconduct in department programs. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapters 1, 3 and 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 402 |
2013-05-22 | House | Effective date(s) 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-22 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0353) |
2013-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0208) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0170 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402