TN SB0176 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases from 24 hours to 12 hours the time in which a drop shipper must report purchaser information after receiving an order. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, decreases from 24 hours to 12 hours the time in which a drop shipper must report purchaser information after receiving an order. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0417 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0176&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0176.pdf |