TN SB0176 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the licensing of and prescribing authority for advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/1/2022 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0184 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee