TN SB0180 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces, from no less than four to no more than four, the number of high school students who may serve on a local board of education as advisory, nonvoting members; deletes the requirement that half of the high school students selected to serve on the board must be enrolled in the college preparatory track and half must be enrolled in the technology track. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, reduces, from no less than four to no more than four, the number of high school students who may serve on a local board of education as advisory, nonvoting members; deletes the requirement that half of the high school students selected to serve on the board must be enrolled in the college preparatory track and half must be enrolled in the technology track. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 192 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0196 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192