TN SB0191 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the levy of the nursing home tax of $2,225 per licensed bed per year from June 30, 2013, to June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, extends the levy of the nursing home tax of $2,225 per licensed bed per year from June 30, 2013, to June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/ recommend |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to last cal. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0185 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0191&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0191.pdf |