TN SB0196 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing truancy and attendance supervisors. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing truancy and attendance supervisors. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0638) |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0173) |
2017-05-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0251) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0399) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0483 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379