TN SB0196 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the Right to Earn a Living Act, including requiring entry regulations, public service restrictions, and statutes to be demonstrably necessary and carefully tailored to fulfill a legitimate public health or safety objective, and allowing persons to petition applicable licensing authorities and bring civil actions when such standard is not met. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the Right to Earn a Living Act, including requiring entry regulations, public service restrictions, and statutes to be demonstrably necessary and carefully tailored to fulfill a legitimate public health or safety objective, and allowing persons to petition applicable licensing authorities and bring civil actions when such standard is not met. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0261 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee