TN SB0205 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits LEAs to install cameras on school buses to record vehicles that unlawfully pass a stopped school bus; establishes requirements for such cameras and their use. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, permits LEAs to install cameras on school buses to record vehicles that unlawfully pass a stopped school bus; establishes requirements for such cameras and their use. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0268 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 418